FL S0644 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-57, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-57, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida ABLE Program Trust Fund within the State Board of Administration; authorizing sources of funds; specifying the purpose of the trust fund and authorized uses of the assets; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund; providing a directive to the Division of Law Revision and Information, etc.
Title
Florida ABLE Program Trust Fund/State Board of Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#281 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Chapter No. 2015-57, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56) | |
2015-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Substituted for HB 937 |
2015-04-21 | House | Received |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2015-04-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/04/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0642 (Related) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
H0937 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
H0935 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56), CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
H0937 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
H0935 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56), CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)