FL S0644 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the minimum age to operate personal watercraft; removing the exemption from the photographic identification and boating safety identification card requirement for a person accompanied in the vessel by another person who meets certain criteria, etc.
Title
Boating Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0863 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |