FL S0644 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting discrimination on the basis of height or weight in public lodging and food service establishments; revising the general purpose of the Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992; providing civil and administrative remedies for discrimination on the basis of height or weight; prohibiting employment discrimination on the basis of height or weight, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Civil Rights Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2019-10-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H635 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H863 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S1168 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
509092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback