FL S0648 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 549 (Ch. 2019-111)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 549 (Ch. 2019-111)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a licensed dentist to complete a minimum of 2 hours of continuing education on the prescribing of controlled substances biennially, etc.
Title
Continuing Education for Dentists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 549 (Ch. 2019-111) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Substituted HB 549 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H549 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-111
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/648 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/648/BillText/Filed/HTML |