FL S0660 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising criteria under which a nonprofit religious organization that facilitates the sharing of contributions among its participants for financial, physical, or medical needs is exempt from requirements of the code, etc.
Title
Florida Insurance Code Exemption for Nonprofit Religious Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#863 (Y: 89 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Chapter No. 2018-25 | |
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Ordered enrolled 882 |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed; YEAS 89 NAYS 27 |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 1021 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | House | Received |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | In Messages |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (394130) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-12-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1021 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 660