FL S0676 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 475 (Ch. 2019-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 475 (Ch. 2019-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Uniform Certificate of Title for Vessels Act"; revising requirements for application for, and information to be included in, a certificate of title for a vessel; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to retain certain information relating to ownership and titling of vessels; providing that the law of the state under which a vessel's certificate of title is covered governs all issues relating to a certificate of title; requiring a vessel owner to deliver an application for certificate of title to the department by a specified time, etc.
Title
Certificates of Title for Vessels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 475 (Ch. 2019-76) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 475 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H475 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-76
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
328 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 0015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |