FL S0684 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expresses the legislative intent to revise laws relating to construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SSB/Construction [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Regulated Industries
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00052
2009-12-17 Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Rules
2009-11-10 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback