FL S0684 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals s.1, ch. 2010-200, Laws of Florida, relating to future requirements for the use of automated external defibrillators in assisted living facilities, including a provision directing the Department of Elderly Affairs to adopt implementing rules.
Title
Automated External Defibrillators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 56 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 56 | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4059 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/684 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0684/BillText/Filed/HTML |