FL S0684 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to designate a director of manufacturing; amending provisions relating to a tax credit program for capital investment by certain qualifying businesses; requiring a capital investment of at least $10 million as a criteria for a qualified project; providing tax credits for qualifying businesses that are located out of state; providing that a capital investment of a specified amount qualifies a target industry business for the tax refund; creating the Manufacturing Capital Investment Tax Refund Program within the Department of Economic Opportunity; providing for amounts of capital investments for certain manufacturing businesses that are eligible for tax refunds; providing for the application and approval process for qualified projects; authorizing the Division of Strategic Business Development in the Department of Economic Opportunity to adopt rules, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Commerce and Tourism
2012-01-10 Introduced -SJ 58
2011-11-16 Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 58
2011-10-26 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288106Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback