FL S0684 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Re-creating the State Economic Enhancement and Development Trust Fund within the Department of Economic Opportunity without modification; abrogating provisions relating to the termination of the trust fund, to conform, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Economic Enhancement and Development Trust Fund/Department of Economic Opportunity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#524 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-02 Chapter No. 2014-46
2014-06-02 Approved by Governor
2014-05-20 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2014-04-02SenateOrdered enrolled
2014-04-01HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2014-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2014-04-01HouseRead 2nd time
2014-04-01HouseSubstituted for HB 7053
2014-03-28HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/14
2014-03-27HouseReceived
2014-03-27HouseReferred to Calendar
2014-03-04HouseIn Messages
2014-03-04SenateImmediately certified
2014-03-04SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2014-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2014-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-02-21SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/14
2014-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2014-02-20SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2014-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2014-01-28SenateReferred to Appropriations
2014-01-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7053 (Same As) 2014-04-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 684 (Ch. 2014-46)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2881201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback