FL S0684 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the term "convenience business"; removing the requirement that a curriculum be submitted for reapproval biennially with a specified administrative fee; removing a requirement that specified curriculum be subject to reapproval 2 years from initial approval and biennially thereafter, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Convenience Businesses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateLaid on Table
2015-04-22SenateSubstituted HB 755 (Vetoed by Governor)
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-14SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-09SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-03SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-04-02SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-03-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2015-03-10SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/10/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-06SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0439 (Similar To) 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-92
H0755 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
812171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812174Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback