FL S0684 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a sexual predator to register each Internet identifier's corresponding website home page or application software name with the Department of Law Enforcement through the sheriff's office; requiring a sexual predator to report any change to certain information after initial in-person registration in a specified manner; providing that the department's sexual predator registration list is a public record, unless otherwise made exempt or confidential and exempt, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Identifiers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
2017-04-28SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 699
2017-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-25SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-04-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-04-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2017-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/18/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-04-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-04-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2017-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-03SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-02-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0686 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)
H0699 (Same As) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-170
H0701 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 699 (Ch. 2017-170)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985481Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9854815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback