FL S0684 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an honorary designation of a certain transportation facility in a specified county; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations/Tom Petty Memorial Highway

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-12-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-10-30SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback