FL S0690 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to conduct a comprehensive and quantitative needs-based overview of this state's water resources; specifying requirements for the overview; requiring the department to submit a report every 5 years to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Water Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H147 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/690 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/690/BillText/Filed/HTML |