FL S0696 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Florida Retirement System members to be reemployed after retirement under certain conditions; conforming provisions to changes made by the act, etc.
Title
Reemployment After Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0333 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/696 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0696/BillText/Filed/HTML |