FL S0700 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Strategic Fuel Reserve Task Force within the Division of Emergency Management to develop a recommended strategic fuel reserve for an emergency or disaster; requiring the task force to submit a recommended plan to the Governor and the Legislature, etc.
Title
Strategic Fuel Reserve
Sponsors
Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] | Sen. Victor Torres [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-02-01 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Filed |