FL S0700 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the name of a program and creating an additional program within the Department of Juvenile Justice; repealing a provision relating to shared county and state responsibility for juvenile detention; deleting a provision requiring each county that is not a fiscally constrained county to pay its annual percentage share of the total shared detention costs; deleting a requirement that limits diversion program expunction to programs for misdemeanor offenses, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#727 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in returning Messages
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-12SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (601895)
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenateAmendment(s) adopted (204448)
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-02-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-21SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-20SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2020-02-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-28SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-01-28SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/28/20, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-10-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H615 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
S1292 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
H1173 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
H1361 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1144 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H5003 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430582Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9856865Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback