FL S0702 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Chapter No. 2019-60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Chapter No. 2019-60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to qualified blind trusts, etc.
Title
Qualified Blind Trusts
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Lee [R] | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#336 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Chapter No. 2019-60 | |
2019-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6041 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 702 (Ch. 2019-60)