FL S0706 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 341 (Ch. 2013-195)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 341 (Ch. 2013-195)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that, under certain circumstances, specified persons who elect non-stacking limitations on their uninsured motorist insurance coverage are conclusively presumed to have made an informed, knowing acceptance of the limitations on behalf of all insureds, etc.
Title
Uninsured Motorist Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 341 (Ch. 2013-195) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 341 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/13, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/13, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/14/13, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0341 (Same As) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-195
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/706 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0706/BillText/Filed/HTML |