FL S0710 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that, in certain counties, a petition to the value adjustment board may be filed late for good cause; defining the term "good cause"; requiring that late filed petitions be filed within a specified timeframe, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Review of Property Taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-20SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Rules
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1261 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
194011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
194032Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback