FL S0724 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "The Kacen's Cause Act"; requiring a home inspector to include certain information relating to swimming pools in his or her report; requiring that new residential swimming pools meet an additional requirement in order to pass final inspection and receive a certificate of completion, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Swimming Pool Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-20SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-06SenateNow in Community Affairs
2019-03-06SenateFavorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H805 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4688323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51527Amended CodeSee Bill Text
51531Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback