FL S0738 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing domestic and registered foreign limited liability companies to submit biennial reports to the Department of State; authorizing domestic and foreign corporations to submit biennial reports to the department; authorizing domestic and foreign corporations not for profit to submit biennial reports to the department, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annual Business Organization Reports and Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S740 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H507 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H657 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6050114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60701401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071420Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60715101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071530Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
60715315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6071622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
607193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171420Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171530Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6171622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201210Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6209003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62205Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback