FL S0738 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that full-time students who meet specified criteria be excused from jury service upon request, etc.
Title
Jury Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#693 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Chapter No. 2020-57 | |
2020-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-06 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 3 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Now in Education |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Education; Rules |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H393 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 738 passed