FL S0740 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a biennial report filing fee for limited liability companies; authorizing the Department of State to escrow an amount necessary to annualize revenues collected from biennial report filing fees and biennial supplemental corporate fees; establishing a biennial report filing fee for domestic and foreign corporations; establishing a biennial supplemental corporate fee for limited liability companies, domestic and foreign corporations, and domestic and foreign limited partnerships, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Business Organization Reports

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-07SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S738 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H507 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H657 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6050118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6050213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6070122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
607193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6170122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6201109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62081055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback