FL S0766 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the use of drones by law enforcement agencies and other specified entities for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanded Uses of Unmanned Aircraft

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-02SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2019-03-28SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-26SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2019-03-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H75 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S132 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1131 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
93450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback