FL S0772 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a timeframe for certain owners or transferees to apply for a permit; preempting to the Department of Health the regulatory authority for permitting standards; providing that evidence of a certain length of stay in a guest register creates a rebuttable presumption that a guest is transient; specifying when certain property becomes abandoned; authorizing a park operator to refuse certain individuals access to the premises and to eject transient guests or visitors based on specified conduct; providing that certain surf pools are exempt from supervision under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Department of Health's Regulation of Recreational Activities
Sponsors
Senate Health Policy Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Sen. Anitere Flores [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Health Policy; Rules |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H647 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S922 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H343 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-126
S422 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S922 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H343 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-126
S422 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 343
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
513 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |