FL S0776 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring specified health care facilities, as a condition of maintaining licensure, to enact policies requiring employees, contractors, volunteers, and interns of such licensees to report actual or suspected sexual misconduct involving a patient to the licensee, the statewide toll-free complaint telephone number of the Agency for Health Care Administration, and the appropriate local law enforcement agency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Misconduct Reporting in Health Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H665 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
408810Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback