FL S0776 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the composition of the board; requiring the board membership to reflect the ethnic and gender diversity of this state, etc.
Title
Florida Real Estate Appraisal Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1399 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee