FL S0778 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration, in consultation with the Department of Elderly Affairs, to approve entities applying to deliver Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE) services in the state; requiring prospective PACE organizations that are granted initial state approval to submit a complete application to the agency and the Federal Government within a certain timeframe; exempting PACE organizations from specified provisions; specifying requirements for the agency in paying contractors providing services to eligible applicants, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/13/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1123 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43084Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback