FL S0780 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain health care practitioners from specified licensing requirements when providing certain services to veterans in this state; requiring such health care practitioners to submit certain information to the Department of Health; requiring the department to notify such health care practitioners of their exemption within a certain timeframe, etc.
Title
Health Care Licensing Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H409 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/780 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/780/BillText/Filed/HTML |