FL S0788 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional definitions for purposes of the exemption for sales or use of equipment, machinery, and other materials for renewable energy technologies. Includes under the exemption materials used in distributing renewable diesel fuel and renewable fuel oil. Delays expiration of the exemption. Provides additional definitions for purposes of the renewable energy technologies investment tax credit, etc.
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-07 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-22 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00270 | |
2010-03-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-16 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00270; CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -SJ 00272 | |
2010-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/16/10, 9:00 am, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Agriculture; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00056; On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 37-S; CS by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00164; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -SJ 00156; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00164 | |
2010-03-01 | Now in Finance and Tax | |
2010-02-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-02-16 | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-05 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 37-S | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Agriculture; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-11-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0043 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H7229 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7179 (Ch. 2010-139), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7229 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7179 (Ch. 2010-139), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |