FL S0788 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Law Enforcement, in consultation with law enforcement agencies throughout the state, to establish a uniform statewide rule on preparing for and responding to active assailant situations; requiring certain district school boards to develop and execute specified interlocal agreements with certain law enforcement agencies, local fire departments, and local emergency medical services organizations for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Preparedness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-11-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H997 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943688Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback