FL S0800 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain persons under specified circumstances to provide reasonable assistance to another person who is exposed to or has suffered serious bodily injury, etc.
Title
Duty to Assist
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H147 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/800 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/800/BillText/Filed/HTML |