FL S0820 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-228, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-228, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing honorary designations of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers; authorizing the department to permit the erection of a specified marker under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#775 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#775 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Chapter No. 2014-228, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216) | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (586113) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In returning messages |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (586113) |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Received |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-24 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (540444, 843884) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-04-10 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by- Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/08/14, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/03/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0063 (Similar To) 2014-03-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H7149 (Similar To) 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
S0158 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
S0258 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
S0716 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
S1564 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H0521 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H7149 (Similar To) 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
S0158 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
S0258 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
S0716 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
S1564 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H0521 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)