FL S0832 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that the name and identity of a birth parent, an adoptive parent, and an adoptee may be disclosed from the adoption records without a court order under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-10SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-04-10SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/08/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H597 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
382015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback