FL S0844 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "missing endangered person" to include a missing adult who meets the criteria for activation of the Orange Alert of the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement, in cooperation with the Department of Transportation, the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, the Department of the Lottery, and local law enforcement agencies, to establish and implement the Orange Alert; authorizing local law enforcement agencies to broadcast to subscribers of notifications, to the media, and on lottery terminals about certain missing adults, etc.
Title
Orange Alert
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Infrastructure and Security Committee | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H305 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
429 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |