FL S0844 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting a specified portion of the purchase price of certain hurricane shutters and impact-resistant windows from the sales and use tax; defining terms; authorizing the Department of Revenue to adopt emergency rules; providing for expiration of that authority, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Exemption for Hurricane Shutters and Impact-resistant Windows

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-30SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2020-01-29SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-11-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H555 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback