FL S0846 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the inclusion in negotiated plea agreements of costs for the state attorney which are greater than the minimum required, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Costs of Prosecution and Investigation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/28/20, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-22SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-11-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H461 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
93827Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985032Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback