FL S0852 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1259
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the circumstances under which a prisoner who is known to be pregnant may not be restrained; specifying conditions under which restraints may be used; requiring that invasive body cavity searches on a pregnant prisoner be conducted by a medical professional; prohibiting the involuntary placement of pregnant prisoners in restrictive housing, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incarcerated Pregnant Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1259
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1259
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-04SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-01-16SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-11-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S854 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1259 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-89

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944241Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback