FL S0870 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the holding in a jail or other facility intended or used for the detention of adults of a child awaiting trial who is treated as an adult for purposes of criminal prosecution; providing an exception; providing a requirement and a prohibition if a court determines that it is in the interest of justice to allow a child to be held in a jail or other facility intended or used for the detention of adults, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Detention of Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H575 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback