FL S0876 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising provisions concerning the housing of children held in detention; prohibiting a child who has been transferred to adult court for criminal prosecution pursuant to direct file from being held in a jail or other facility used for the detention of adults prior to a hearing to determine if the child should remain in adult court; deleting references to the state attorney's discretion to direct file a juvenile, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Filing of an Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-04-10SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/08/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1293 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H575 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
H339 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H6051 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S850 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1260 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985565Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback