FL S0882 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing responsibilities of certain employers and employees; requiring certain employers to provide annual training for employees and supervisors; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, in conjunction with the Department of Health, to adopt specified rules, etc.
Title
Heat Illness Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Health Policy; Rules |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H513 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/882 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/882/BillText/Filed/HTML |