FL S0884 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the terms "certified master social worker" and "practice of generalist social work"; requiring the Department of Health to certify an applicant for designation as a certified master social worker under certain circumstances; requiring the use of applicable professional titles by licensees, certificate holders, provisional licensees, and registrants on social media and other specified materials, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinical Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists, and Mental Health Counselors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-03SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H509 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H247 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S188 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
S1042 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H7031 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
414065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491015Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback