FL S0884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that an allegation or complaint of misconduct against a law enforcement officer or a correctional officer may originate from any source; authorizing law enforcement and correctional agencies to request a separate agency to conduct an investigation of a complaint under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Law Enforcement and Correctional Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (613272) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H453 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H573 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-104
H573 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-104
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |