FL S0890 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring licensed drug-testing facilities to perform prescreening tests on urine specimens to determine their validity; revising required information in a written policy statement provided to employees and job applicants before drug testing; revising the frequency of required followup drug testing; deleting and revising confidentiality requirements for employers relating to certain information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug-free Workplaces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-21SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-20SenateRemaining references corrected to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-20SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H707 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1120455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback