FL S0892 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising statute of limitations periods for prosecution of certain sexual offenses; specifying that the period for prosecution of certain sexual offenses may not begin until results of specified testing have been received by certain law enforcement agencies; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement to create and maintain a database for tracking sexual offense evidence kits and other DNA evidence, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H541 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H69 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H199 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Ordered enrolled
S170 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 199
H727 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1028 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943326Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback