FL S0894 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Access to Responsible Credit Pilot Program within the Office of Financial Regulation; requiring a program license from the office to advertise, offer, or make program loans or to impose certain charges or fees; specifying requirements for program licensees, program loans, loan repayments, rescissions, interest rates, program loan refinancing, receipts, disclosures and statements provided by program licensees to borrowers, origination fees, insufficient funds fees, and delinquency charges, etc.
Title
Business Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/15/20, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H857 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
516 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |