FL S0896 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Responsible Roadways Act"; providing that motor vehicle liability policies issued or renewed after a specified date may not include personal injury protection; increasing the minimum required limits of bodily injury and property damage liability coverages for proof of financial responsibility; providing that, under certain third-party claims, a motor vehicle liability insurer is not liable beyond available policy limits if it meets certain conditions; repealing provisions which comprise the Florida Motor Vehicle No-Fault Law, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2019-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H733 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1052 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1464 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H301 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3240221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62706501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270652Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627734Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627737Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627739Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627748Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6278405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
628909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71378Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817234Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback