FL S0902 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing counties to provide notice to certain persons under certain circumstances; authorizing counties that issue building permits to charge a person a single search fee for a certain amount under certain circumstances; authorizing the governing bodies of municipalities to charge a person a single search fee for a certain amount under certain circumstances; providing exemptions to certain contracting requirements; authorizing a local government to provide notice to certain persons under certain circumstances within a specified timeframe, etc.
Title
Building Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2019-75) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 447 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H447 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-75
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 7905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |