FL S0904 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "catastrophic ground cover collapse" for insurance coverage purposes; specifying circumstances under which settling or cracking of a foundation, structure, or building constitutes a loss resulting from a catastrophic ground cover collapse; defining the term "dangerous", etc.
Title
Sinkhole and Catastrophic Ground Cover Collapse Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H399 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/904 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/904/BillText/Filed/HTML |